|
09/25/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4679.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5020.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|