California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 9, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022