|
08/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5875.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4686.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 4746.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|