California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2037 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 2037 CHAPTER 155 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. [ Approved by Governor August 22, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State August 22, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
1+Enrolled August 16, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 08, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 02, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2037Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 2037 CHAPTER 155 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. [ Approved by Governor August 22, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State August 22, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled August 16, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 08, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 02, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 2037Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 2037 CHAPTER 155
5+ Enrolled August 16, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 08, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2022 Amended IN Senate June 02, 2022
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 2037
7+Enrolled August 16, 2022
8+Passed IN Senate August 08, 2022
9+Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2022
10+Amended IN Senate June 02, 2022
811
9- CHAPTER 155
12+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
13+
14+ Assembly Bill
15+
16+No. 2037
17+
18+Introduced by Assembly Member FloraFebruary 14, 2022
19+
20+Introduced by Assembly Member Flora
21+February 14, 2022
1022
1123 An act to amend Section 12288 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor August 22, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State August 22, 2022. ]
1424
1525 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1626
1727 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1828
1929 AB 2037, Flora. Polling places: alcoholic beverages.
2030
2131 Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.This bill would delete that prohibition.
2232
2333 Existing law prohibits an establishment where the primary purpose is the sale and dispensation of alcoholic beverages from being used as a polling place.
2434
2535 This bill would delete that prohibition.
2636
2737 ## Digest Key
2838
2939 ## Bill Text
3040
3141 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
3242
3343 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3444
3545 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3646
3747 SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
3848
3949 SECTION 1. Section 12288 of the Elections Code is amended to read:
4050
4151 ### SECTION 1.
4252
4353 12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
4454
4555 12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
4656
4757 12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.
4858
4959
5060
5161 12288. A polling place shall not be accessible by a door, window, or other opening to any place where any alcoholic beverage is sold or dispensed while the polls are open.