Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2022
|
6-16-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-15-2022
|
|
|
|
06/09/2022
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|