California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill May 3, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022