California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2043 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022