California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2022

Amended

Bill June 9, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022