|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 775, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4939.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 23.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4737.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|