California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2167 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022