Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4832.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|