California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Amended

Bill August 1, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022