|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 17.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4989.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 15.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|