California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 25, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022