|
09/28/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2841.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1751.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|