California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2021

Amended

Bill July 15, 2021
Bill May 24, 2021