|
09/18/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 4837.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|