California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2268 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022