California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2316 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2022

Amended

Bill August 24, 2022
Bill August 11, 2022
Bill August 1, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill June 13, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022