|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 868, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5059.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 4571.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|