California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 17, 2022
Bill June 28, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022