|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 869, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 5056.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4815.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|