California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 23, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022