California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill July 12, 2022

Amended

Bill June 22, 2022
Bill May 25, 2022