|
09/05/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 19.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 5185.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 21. Page 3423.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 44. Noes 16. Page 3397.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 43. Noes 13. Page 3346.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2022
|
Assembly Rule 47.1 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 15. Page 3342.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Lorena Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 2124.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Lorena Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 27. Page 1909.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1059.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|