California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Bill April 28, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021