|
06/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 19.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4531.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 4856.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|