California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2022

Chaptered

Bill June 30, 2022

Amended

Bill June 15, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022