|
09/24/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 294, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2627.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1248.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1029.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|