California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2021

Amended

Bill August 18, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021