Assembly | 01/27/2022 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | In committee: Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | Read first time. To print. |