California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022