|
09/06/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4908.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4611.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4502.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|