California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022