California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2687 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2022

Amended

Bill June 16, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022