Assembly | 05/19/2022 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2022 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |