Assembly
|
09/29/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 2.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 5011.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4914.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on C. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|