California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2716 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022