|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5183.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 20. Page 5004.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2022
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2022
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|