California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2746 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022