|
10/06/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 5. Page 2460.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1906.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1694.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 2. Page 1064.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|