California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB275 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2021

Amended

Bill June 30, 2021
Bill June 21, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021