|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4944.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|