California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2771 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 30, 2022