California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2780 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 22, 2022
Bill May 5, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022