|
09/29/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5013.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|