California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2863 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 10, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022