|
09/13/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5099.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4655.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2022
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|