California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2916 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 24, 2022