|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 229, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2640.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2228.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1469.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|